MA H3773 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3827
Note: Legislation replaced by H3862
Note: Legislation replaced by H3862
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Making appropriations for fiscal year 2021 to provide for supplementing certain existing appropriations and for certain other activities and projects
Title
Making appropriations for fiscal year 2021 to provide for supplementing certain existing appropriations and for certain other activities and projects
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2021-06-09 | House | Reported, in part, by H3862 |
2021-06-01 | House | Reported, in part, by H3827 |
2021-05-20 | House | Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H3827 (Replaced by) 2021-06-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 22 of the Acts of 2021
H3862 (Replaced by) 2021-06-10 - Published as amended, see H3871
H3871 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Accompanied H3973
S2487 (Similar To) 2021-08-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 45 of the Acts of 2021
H3973 (Similar To) 2021-07-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 29 of the Acts of 2021
H4211 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 87 of the Acts of 2021
H4361 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4997
H4362 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4996
H4633 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Read for its information
H5187 (Similar To) 2022-08-15 - See H5151
H3862 (Replaced by) 2021-06-10 - Published as amended, see H3871
H3871 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Accompanied H3973
S2487 (Similar To) 2021-08-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 45 of the Acts of 2021
H3973 (Similar To) 2021-07-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 29 of the Acts of 2021
H4211 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 87 of the Acts of 2021
H4361 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4997
H4362 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4996
H4633 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Read for its information
H5187 (Similar To) 2022-08-15 - See H5151
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3773 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3773.pdf |