MA H5150 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4673
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 188 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 188 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the commissioner of capital asset management and maintenance to convey a certain parcel of land to the town of Salisbury
Title
Authorizing the commissioner of capital asset management and maintenance to convey a certain parcel of land to the town of Salisbury
Sponsors
House House Committee on Ways and Means | House Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight | Rep. James Kelcourse [R] | Sen. Diana DiZoglio [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-15 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 188 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-08-08 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2022-08-08 | House | Enacted |
2022-08-08 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2022-08-08 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2022-08-04 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-08-04 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2022-07-30 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-07-30 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-07-30 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-07-30 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-07-30 | House | New draft of H4673 |
2022-07-30 | House | Pending new draft of H4673 |
2022-07-30 | House | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H4673 (Replaces) 2022-07-30 - New draft substituted, see H5150
H5148 (Similar To) 2022-07-30 - Text of an amendment, see S3065
H5146 (Similar To) 2022-07-30 - Text of an amendment, see S3053
H5144 (Similar To) 2022-07-30 - Text of an amendment, see S3004
H5147 (Similar To) 2022-07-30 - Text of an amendment, see S3062
H5145 (Similar To) 2022-07-30 - Text of an amendment, see S3031
S1358 (Similar To) 2021-07-29 - New draft substituted, see S2503
S2320 (Similar To) 2021-07-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1366 (Similar To) 2021-07-15 - Accompanied H3867
S2741 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2806
H3188 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3994
S3090 (Similar To) 2022-08-11 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Bills in the Third Reading
S3091 (Similar To) 2022-08-11 - Message read and placed on file
H5156 (Similar To) 2022-10-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 249 of the Acts of 2022
H4098 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4520 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4673
H5148 (Similar To) 2022-07-30 - Text of an amendment, see S3065
H5146 (Similar To) 2022-07-30 - Text of an amendment, see S3053
H5144 (Similar To) 2022-07-30 - Text of an amendment, see S3004
H5147 (Similar To) 2022-07-30 - Text of an amendment, see S3062
H5145 (Similar To) 2022-07-30 - Text of an amendment, see S3031
S1358 (Similar To) 2021-07-29 - New draft substituted, see S2503
S2320 (Similar To) 2021-07-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1366 (Similar To) 2021-07-15 - Accompanied H3867
S2741 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2806
H3188 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3994
S3090 (Similar To) 2022-08-11 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Bills in the Third Reading
S3091 (Similar To) 2022-08-11 - Message read and placed on file
H5156 (Similar To) 2022-10-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 249 of the Acts of 2022
H4098 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4520 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4673
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5150 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5150.pdf |