MA H5145 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S3031
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on July 30 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-30 - Text of an amendment, see S3031
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 30 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-30 - Text of an amendment, see S3031
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Similar Bills
Title
Similar Bills
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-30 | House | Text of an amendment, see S3031 |
Same As/Similar To
S3031 (Replaced by) 2022-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 165 of the Acts of 2022
S1358 (Similar To) 2021-07-29 - New draft substituted, see S2503
S1366 (Similar To) 2021-07-15 - Accompanied H3867
H3188 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3994
H3217 (Similar To) 2022-06-21 - New draft substituted, see H4901
S3019 (Similar To) 2022-07-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S3028
S3028 (Similar To) 2022-07-25 - New draft (Gobi) substituted, see S3031
S1358 (Similar To) 2021-07-29 - New draft substituted, see S2503
S1366 (Similar To) 2021-07-15 - Accompanied H3867
H3188 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3994
H3217 (Similar To) 2022-06-21 - New draft substituted, see H4901
S3019 (Similar To) 2022-07-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S3028
S3028 (Similar To) 2022-07-25 - New draft (Gobi) substituted, see S3031
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5145 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5145.pdf |