MA S3028 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S3019
Note: Legislation replaced by S3031
Note: Legislation replaced by S3031
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on July 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-25 - New draft (Gobi) substituted, see S3031
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-25 - New draft (Gobi) substituted, see S3031
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the conveyance of certain parcels of real estate by and between the division of conservation and recreation and the town of Holden, reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 3028).
Title
Authorizing the conveyance of certain parcels of real estate by and between the department of conservation and recreation and the town of Holden
Sponsors
House Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight | Sen. Anne Gobi [D] | Rep. Kimberly Ferguson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-25 | Senate | New draft (Gobi) substituted, see S3031 |
2022-07-25 | Senate | Read third |
2022-07-25 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2022-07-21 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-07-21 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee |
2022-07-21 | Senate | New draft of S3019 |
2022-07-21 | Senate | Reported from the committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S3019 (Replaces) 2022-07-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S3028
S3029 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 150 of the Acts of 2022
S154 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2709
S2174 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1357 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 58 of the Acts of 2022
S574 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied H929
S148 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S3031 (Replaced by) 2022-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 165 of the Acts of 2022
S3053 (Similar To) 2022-08-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 170 of the Acts of 2022
H5096 (Similar To) 2022-07-26 - Read third and passed to be engrossed
H5144 (Similar To) 2022-07-30 - Text of an amendment, see S3004
S3090 (Similar To) 2022-08-11 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Bills in the Third Reading
S3091 (Similar To) 2022-08-11 - Message read and placed on file
H5153 (Similar To) 2022-07-31 - Text of an amendment, see S3064
H5145 (Similar To) 2022-07-30 - Text of an amendment, see S3031
S1359 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2630
H3196 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5256
S3029 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 150 of the Acts of 2022
S154 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2709
S2174 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1357 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 58 of the Acts of 2022
S574 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied H929
S148 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S3031 (Replaced by) 2022-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 165 of the Acts of 2022
S3053 (Similar To) 2022-08-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 170 of the Acts of 2022
H5096 (Similar To) 2022-07-26 - Read third and passed to be engrossed
H5144 (Similar To) 2022-07-30 - Text of an amendment, see S3004
S3090 (Similar To) 2022-08-11 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Bills in the Third Reading
S3091 (Similar To) 2022-08-11 - Message read and placed on file
H5153 (Similar To) 2022-07-31 - Text of an amendment, see S3064
H5145 (Similar To) 2022-07-30 - Text of an amendment, see S3031
S1359 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2630
H3196 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5256
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S3028 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S3028.pdf |