MA H4830 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4758
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 196 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 196 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Nauset regional school district to enter into renewable energy agreements
Title
Authorizing the Nauset regional school district to enter into renewable energy agreements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-23 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 196 of the Acts of 2020 | |
2020-10-19 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2020-10-19 | House | Enacted |
2020-10-19 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2020-10-19 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2020-10-15 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2020-10-15 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-10-14 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2020-08-03 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2020-07-31 | House | Read second, ordered third, rules suspended, read third, amended, and passed to be engrossed |
2020-07-31 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-07-31 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2020-07-07 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2020-07-07 | House | New draft of H4758 |
2020-07-07 | House | Reported from the committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H4758 (Replaces) 2020-07-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4830
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4830 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4830.pdf |