MA H4745 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H2891
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on July 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to authorizing the committee on Elder Affairs to make an investigation and study of a certain House document concerning capital reimbursements to a nursing facility
Title
Capital Reimbursements to a Nursing Facility
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-12 | House | Discharged to the committee on House Rules |
2018-07-12 | House | Order reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Joint Rules |
2018-07-12 | House | Accompanied by H2891 |
2018-07-12 | House | Reported from the committee on Elder Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
H2891 (Replaces) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4745
S346 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3821 (Similar To) 2017-11-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 139 of the Acts of 2017
S2419 (Similar To) 2018-05-03 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4537 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4706 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4861 (Similar To) 2018-07-31 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4685 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4591 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4625 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S346 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3821 (Similar To) 2017-11-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 139 of the Acts of 2017
S2419 (Similar To) 2018-05-03 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4537 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4706 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4861 (Similar To) 2018-07-31 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4685 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4591 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4625 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4745 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4745.pdf |