MA H2891 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4745
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4745
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4745
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to providing retroactive capital reimbursement for a certain nursing facility in the town of Holden. Elder Affairs.
Title
Relative to retroactive capital reimbursement for a certain nursing facility
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-12 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4745 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-02-07 | House | Amendment (changing reporting date to Wednesday May 9, 2018) adopted, pending concurrence |
2018-02-07 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 15, 2018, pending concurrence |
2017-08-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/11/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S354 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2551
H2071 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4659
H4745 (Replaced by) 2018-07-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2071 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4659
H4745 (Replaced by) 2018-07-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2891 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2891.pdf |