MA S346 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the prevention and elimination of discrimination based on sexual orientation and gender identity and expression within the Department of Elder Affairs. Elder Affairs.
Title
Relative to LGBT awareness training for aging services providers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Accompanied by H2892 |
2017-09-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/11/2017 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S364 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2419
S1715 (Similar To) 2018-06-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2892 (Similar To) 2018-03-28 - Accompanied S346
S1715 (Similar To) 2018-06-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2892 (Similar To) 2018-03-28 - Accompanied S346
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S346 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S346.pdf |