MA H4631 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 133 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 133 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to a conservation restriction in the town of Hanson. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to a conservation restriction in the town of Hanson
Sponsors
Rep. Josh Cutler [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-07-28 - Senate - Senate Enacted Roll Call #225 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-02 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 133 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-07-28 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2022-07-28 | Senate | Enacted -see Roll Call #225 (Yeas 39 to Nays 0) |
2022-07-28 | House | Enacted - 153 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 241 ) |
2022-07-28 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2022-07-28 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2022-07-21 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-07-19 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-06-28 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-06-15 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2022-05-12 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-04-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/20/2022 from 02:30 PM-04:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-03-28 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S29 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 18 of the Acts of 2022
S1366 (Similar To) 2021-07-15 - Accompanied H3867
H3785 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4635 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5024 (Similar To) 2022-07-31 - New draft substituted, see H5155
S1366 (Similar To) 2021-07-15 - Accompanied H3867
H3785 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4635 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5024 (Similar To) 2022-07-31 - New draft substituted, see H5155
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4631 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4631.pdf |
Roll Call | https://malegislature.gov/RollCall/192/SenateRollCall225.pdf |