MA H4635 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Hanson be authorized to grant special one-day licenses to sell all alcoholic beverages to certain organizations in said town. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Hanson to grant special one-day licenses to sell all alcoholic beverages to certain organizations in said town
Sponsors
Rep. Josh Cutler [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-04-28 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 17, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-04-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/25/2022 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S199 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
H380 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3811
H3831 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4240
H383 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3812
H3715 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3813
H3712 (Similar To) 2022-01-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2022
H380 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3811
H3831 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4240
H383 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3812
H3715 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3813
H3712 (Similar To) 2022-01-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2022
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4635 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4635.pdf |