MA H3785 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to boater safety. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to boater safety to be known as the David Hanson Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-03-24 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-12-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/04/2022 from 01:00 PM-06:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-05-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3785 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3785.pdf |