MA H4560 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on July 30 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-30 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 30 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-30 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to expanded access to therapies for the treatment of Lyme Disease
Title
Relative to expanded access to therapies for the treatment of Lyme Disease
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-07-30 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S1 (Similar To) 2015-01-08 - Placed on file
H49 (Similar To) 2015-02-11 - Reported, in part, by H52
H55 (Similar To) 2015-04-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 13 of the Acts of 2015
H59 (Similar To) 2016-01-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 165 of the Acts of 2015
H60 (Similar To) 2015-03-26 - Reported, in part, by H3203
H4756 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 393 of the Acts of 2016
H4755 (Similar To) 2016-12-12 - See H2319
H3675 (Similar To) 2015-07-20 - See H3650
H61 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H3187 (Similar To) 2015-04-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 11 of the Acts of 2015
H3202 (Similar To) 2015-03-25 - Referred to the committee on House Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets
H49 (Similar To) 2015-02-11 - Reported, in part, by H52
H55 (Similar To) 2015-04-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 13 of the Acts of 2015
H59 (Similar To) 2016-01-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 165 of the Acts of 2015
H60 (Similar To) 2015-03-26 - Reported, in part, by H3203
H4756 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 393 of the Acts of 2016
H4755 (Similar To) 2016-12-12 - See H2319
H3675 (Similar To) 2015-07-20 - See H3650
H61 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H3187 (Similar To) 2015-04-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 11 of the Acts of 2015
H3202 (Similar To) 2015-03-25 - Referred to the committee on House Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4560 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4560.pdf |