MA H4446 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Adopted, in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Adopted, in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Similar Bills
Title
Similar Bills
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | Adopted, in concurrence |
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-04-25 | House | Adopted |
2018-04-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-04-25 | House | Committee reported ought to be adopted |
2018-04-25 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
S2340 (Similar To) 2018-03-21 - Adopted, in concurrence
S2439 (Similar To) 2018-05-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2440 (Similar To) 2018-05-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4172 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4173 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2508 (Similar To) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2578 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Senate concurred in the House amendment
S2439 (Similar To) 2018-05-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2440 (Similar To) 2018-05-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4172 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4173 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2508 (Similar To) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2578 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Senate concurred in the House amendment
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4446 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4446.pdf |