MA H4436 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4520
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4520
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4520
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to modernize civil service laws to assist in the recruiting and hiring of municipal public safety employees. Public Service.
Title
To modernize civil service laws
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4520 |
2024-02-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/04/2024 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-20 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H2654 (Similar To) 2024-08-05 - Reporting date extended to Thursday October 31, 2024, pending concurrence
H4520 (Replaced by) 2024-04-18 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4520 (Replaced by) 2024-04-18 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4436 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4436.pdf |