MA H4424 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on August 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-11 - Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on August 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-11 - Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for the financing of certain improvements to municipal roads and bridges
Title
Providing for the financing of certain improvements to municipal roads and bridges
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-11 | House | Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2016-08-11 | House | For message, see H4577 |
2016-08-10 | House | Governor returned to the House with veto |
2016-08-10 | Signed (in part) by the Governor, Chapter 220 of the Acts of 2016 | |
2016-07-31 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2016-07-31 | Senate | Enacted -see Roll Call #637 [Yeas 38 to Nays 1] |
2016-07-30 | House | Enacted 158 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 412) |
2016-07-30 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2016-07-28 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2016-07-28 | Senate | Senate concurred the further House amendment |
2016-07-28 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-07-28 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment with a further amendment, striking out all after the enactng clause and inserting in place thereof the text of an amendment, H4557 |
2016-07-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2016-07-23 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #428 [YEAS 39 - NAYS 0] |
2016-07-23 | Senate | Read third |
2016-07-23 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-07-23 | Senate | For Senate actions, see, S2455 |
2016-07-23 | Senate | Amendment (as recommended by the committee on Senate Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets ) adopted, as amended |
2016-07-23 | Senate | Amendment (as recommended by the committee on Senate Ways and Means) adopted, as amended |
2016-07-23 | Senate | Read second |
2016-07-21 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the Day for Saturday, July 23, 2016 |
2016-07-21 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2016-07-21 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, inserting in place thereof the text of S2455 |
2016-07-19 | Senate | Referred to the committee on Senate Ways an Means |
2016-07-19 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, inserting in place there of the text of S2447 |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Hearing scheduled for 07/05/2016 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in 222 |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets |
2016-06-22 | House | Passed to be engrossed 156 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 283) |
2016-06-22 | House | Amendment 6 adopted |
2016-06-22 | House | Amendment 5 rejected |
2016-06-22 | House | Amendment 4 rejected |
2016-06-22 | House | Read third |
2016-06-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-06-22 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-06-22 | House | New draft of H4057 |
2016-06-22 | House | Pending new draft of H4057 |
2016-06-22 | House | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
S2455 (Replaced by) 2016-07-23 - See H4424
H4577 (Replaced by) 2016-08-11 - See H4424
H65 (Similar To) 2015-03-31 - Reported by H3333
H66 (Similar To) 2015-08-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 64 of the Acts of 2015
H3189 (Similar To) 2015-05-04 - Reported by H3353
H3203 (Similar To) 2015-03-30 - House insisted on its amendment
H3773 (Similar To) 2015-09-30 - Published as amended, see H3785
H4765 (Similar To) 2016-12-15 - Text of an amendment, see S2233
H4766 (Similar To) 2016-12-15 - Text of an amendment, see S2377
H4767 (Similar To) 2017-01-03 - Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
H4057 (Replaces) 2016-06-22 - Amendment adopted (as recommended by the House committee on Ways and Means), see H4424
H4577 (Replaced by) 2016-08-11 - See H4424
H65 (Similar To) 2015-03-31 - Reported by H3333
H66 (Similar To) 2015-08-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 64 of the Acts of 2015
H3189 (Similar To) 2015-05-04 - Reported by H3353
H3203 (Similar To) 2015-03-30 - House insisted on its amendment
H3773 (Similar To) 2015-09-30 - Published as amended, see H3785
H4765 (Similar To) 2016-12-15 - Text of an amendment, see S2233
H4766 (Similar To) 2016-12-15 - Text of an amendment, see S2377
H4767 (Similar To) 2017-01-03 - Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
H4057 (Replaces) 2016-06-22 - Amendment adopted (as recommended by the House committee on Ways and Means), see H4424
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4424 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4424.pdf |