MA S2455 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4424
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on July 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-23 - See H4424
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-23 - See H4424
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SENATE, Thursday, July 21, 2016 - The committee on Ways and Means, to whom was referred the House Bill financing improvements to municipal roads and bridges (House, No. 4424) (the committee on Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets having recommended that the bill be amended by substituting a new text (Senate, No. 2447); reports, recommending that the same ought to pass with an amendment striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of Senate document numbered 2455.
Title
Financing improvements to municipal roads and bridges
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-23 | Senate | See H4424 |
2016-07-23 | Senate | Ways and Means amendment adopted, as amended |
2016-07-23 | Senate | Amendment #10 (Spilka) adopted |
2016-07-23 | Senate | Amendment #9 (Rush) rejected |
2016-07-23 | Senate | Amendment #8 (Rush) rejected |
2016-07-23 | Senate | Amendment #7 (Rush) rejected |
2016-07-23 | Senate | Amendment #6 (Rush) rejected |
2016-07-23 | Senate | Amendment #5 (Joyce) adopted |
2016-07-23 | Senate | Amendment #4 (Tarr) adopted |
2016-07-23 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Gobi) rejected |
2016-07-23 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Donnelly) rejected |
2016-07-23 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Moore) rejected |
2016-07-21 | Senate | Recommended new text for H4424 |
2016-07-21 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H4424 (Replaced by) 2016-08-11 - Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S945 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1549 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1776 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2388
S1750 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2388
S216 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2215
S1454 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1020 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
S1364 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1358 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1382 (Similar To) 2016-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S945 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1549 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1776 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2388
S1750 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2388
S216 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2215
S1454 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1020 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
S1364 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1358 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1382 (Similar To) 2016-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2455 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2455.pdf |