MA H4359 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 32-19)
Status: Engrossed on January 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-04 - Amendment #1 (Speliotis) adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-04 - Amendment #1 (Speliotis) adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the Registry of Motor Vehicles to issue distinctive registration plates for Medal of Liberty recipients. Transportation.
Title
Establishing a distinctive registration plate for Medal of Liberty recipients
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-04 | House | Amendment #1 (Speliotis) adopted |
2021-01-04 | House | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2021-01-04 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-11-04 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-11-04 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-11-04 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2020-11-04 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2020-07-22 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2020-07-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-07-06 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday July 20, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-06-01 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday July 2, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-27 | House | House concurred |
2020-03-23 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Monday June 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday March 25, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-01-21 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
2020-01-13 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4359 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4359.pdf |