MA H4265 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-11-24 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

That the city of Salem be authorized to appoint retired Salem firefighters as special firefighters in said city. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the appointment of retired Salem firefighters as special firefighters within the city of Salem

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-24SenateSenate concurred
2021-11-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

S2398 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/24/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1704 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Hearing scheduled for 11/16/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1739 (Similar To) 2021-09-21 - Hearing scheduled for 09/28/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1747 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1734 (Similar To) 2021-10-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 59 of the Acts of 2021

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback