MA H4221 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 36 of the Acts of 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 36 of the Acts of 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substituted, on motion of Mr. Walsh of Peabody, for a bill with the same title (House, No. 4080). December 18, 2023.
Title
Amending the special act charter of the town of Northampton
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-29 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 36 of the Acts of 2024 | |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2024-02-20 | House | Enacted |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2023-12-21 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2023-12-18 | House | Passed to be engrossed |
2023-12-18 | House | Substituted for H4080 |
Same As/Similar To
H4080 (Similar To) 2023-12-18 - Amended by substitution of bill with the same title, see H4221
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4221 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4221.pdf |