MA H3747 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4093

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-14 - Amended by substitution of bill with the same title, see H4093
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the home rule charter of the city of Beverly. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the home rule charter of the city of Beverly

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-09-14HouseAmended by substitution of bill with the same title, see H4093
2023-09-14HouseRead third
2023-07-31HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2023-07-31HouseRules suspended
2023-07-31HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2023-07-17HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2023-06-12JointHearing scheduled for 06/20/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2023-04-13SenateSenate concurred
2023-04-10HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Same As/Similar To

H4080 (Similar To) 2023-12-18 - Amended by substitution of bill with the same title, see H4221
H4093 (Replaced by) 2023-09-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 48 of the Acts of 2023
H4221 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 36 of the Acts of 2024
H4285 (Similar To) 2024-07-15 - Amended by substitution of bill with the same title, see H4868
H4868 (Similar To) 2024-07-18 - Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback