MA H4093 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 48 of the Acts of 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Substituted, on motion of Mr. Walsh of Peabody, for a bill with the same title (House No. 3747) [Local Approval Received]. September 14, 2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the home rule charter of the city of Beverly

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-09-29 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 48 of the Acts of 2023
2023-09-25SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2023-09-25HouseEnacted
2023-09-25SenateRead second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
2023-09-25SenateTaken out of the Orders of the Day
2023-09-18SenateRead; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2023-09-14HousePassed to be engrossed
2023-09-14HouseSubstituted for H3747

Same As/Similar To

H3747 (Similar To) 2023-09-14 - Amended by substitution of bill with the same title, see H4093
H4080 (Similar To) 2023-12-18 - Amended by substitution of bill with the same title, see H4221
H4221 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 36 of the Acts of 2024
H4285 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Read second and ordered to a third reading

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback