MA H4221 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-16 - Hearing scheduled for 05/18/2016 from 12:00 PM-01:00 PM in 222
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-16 - Hearing scheduled for 05/18/2016 from 12:00 PM-01:00 PM in 222
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to classify court officer I, court officer II, and court officer III in Group 4 of the contributory retirement system for public employees. Public Service.
Title
Relative to defining employees classified in Group 4
Sponsors
Rep. Tackey Chan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/18/2016 from 12:00 PM-01:00 PM in 222 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-04-06 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2015-05-07 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4221 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4221.pdf |