MA H4168 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 30 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-04 - Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on August 30 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-04 - Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the town of Danvers to grant an additional license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premise. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Danvers to grant an additional license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-04 | Senate | Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2012-08-30 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2012-07-31 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-07-31 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-07-27 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for a second reading |
2012-07-16 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-07-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2012 from 03:00 PM-03:30 PM in A-2 |
2012-06-25 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-06-13 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H4168 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=118817&generalCourtId=1 |