MA H4105 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4364

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on September 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4364
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

By Representative Khan of Newton and Senator Creem, a joint petition (subject to Joint Rule 12) of Kay Khan, Cynthia Stone Creem and others that the commissioner of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance be authorized to convey a certain parcel land in the city of Newton to said city for affordable housing or general municipal purposes. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the commissioner of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance to convey a certain parcel of land to the city of Newton

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-05HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H4364
2019-11-12JointHearing scheduled for 11/19/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2019-10-03SenateSenate concurred
2019-09-30HouseReported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight
2019-09-25HouseReferred to the committee on House Rules

Same As/Similar To

H2749 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - New draft substituted, see H4819
H4364 (Replaced by) 2020-07-27 - New draft substituted, see H4892

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback