MA H2749 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4819
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-29 - New draft substituted, see H4819
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-29 - New draft substituted, see H4819
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the conveyance by the commissioner of Capital Management and Maintenance of a certain parcel of land in the city of Lowell. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to the conveyance of a certain parcel of land in the city of Lowell
Sponsors
Rep. Rady Mom [D] | Rep. Josh Cutler [D] | Rep. David LeBoeuf [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | House | New draft substituted, see H4819 |
2020-06-29 | House | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) |
2020-06-29 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-06-29 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending |
2020-06-29 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2020-06-29 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill, see H4819 |
2019-04-16 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-03-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H4105 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4364
H4819 (Replaced by) 2020-07-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 129 of the Acts of 2020
H4819 (Replaced by) 2020-07-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 129 of the Acts of 2020
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2749 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2749.pdf |