MA H4041 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H2113
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on November 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To protect Massachusetts pollinators
Title
To protect Massachusetts pollinators
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2017-11-20 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2017-11-20 | House | New draft of H2113 and S2164 |
2017-11-20 | House | Reported from the committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H2113 (Replaces) 2017-11-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4041
H35 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4785
H1728 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H185 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H2126 (Similar To) 2018-05-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4544
S2150 (Similar To) 2017-05-25 - See S3
H4151 (Similar To) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4684
S2336 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - New draft substituted, see S2610
S2357 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H460 (Similar To) 2017-12-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2230
H4613 (Similar To) 2018-07-26 - Accompanied H4835
S1337 (Similar To) 2018-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S796 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H804 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2692 (Similar To) 2018-12-20 - See H4988
H35 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4785
H1728 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H185 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H2126 (Similar To) 2018-05-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4544
S2150 (Similar To) 2017-05-25 - See S3
H4151 (Similar To) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4684
S2336 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - New draft substituted, see S2610
S2357 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H460 (Similar To) 2017-12-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2230
H4613 (Similar To) 2018-07-26 - Accompanied H4835
S1337 (Similar To) 2018-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S796 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H804 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2692 (Similar To) 2018-12-20 - See H4988
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4041 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4041.pdf |