MA H4028 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish within the Department of Housing and Community Development a commission to review equitable city planning and development. Community Development and Small Businesses.
Title
To establish a commission to review equitable city planning and development
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-02-22 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-11-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/23/2021 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-07-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-07-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Community Development and Small Businesses |
Same As/Similar To
H2091 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5225
H302 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2850 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H558 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5099
H1601 (Similar To) 2022-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4716
H4017 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2021
H2695 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S49 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
H302 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2850 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H558 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5099
H1601 (Similar To) 2022-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4716
H4017 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2021
H2695 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S49 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4028 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4028.pdf |