MA H1601 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4716
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4716
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4716
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a commission (including members of the General Court) on electronic notarization. The Judiciary.
Title
Establishing a commission on electronic notarization
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4716 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-03 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday April 15, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-09-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H2091 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5225
H302 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2850 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H558 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5099
H4017 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2021
H2695 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S49 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
H4716 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1067 (Similar To) 2022-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4716
H609 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H302 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2850 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H558 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5099
H4017 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2021
H2695 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S49 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
H4716 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1067 (Similar To) 2022-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4716
H609 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1601 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1601.pdf |