MA H3984 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4091
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on March 26 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-19 - New draft substituted, see H4091
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-19 - New draft substituted, see H4091
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to improve public schools and narrow the achievement gap. March 26, 2014.
Title
Relative to improving student achievement
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-19 | House | New draft substituted, see H4091 |
2014-05-19 | House | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) |
2014-05-19 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-05-19 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting with the amendment pending |
2014-05-19 | House | Referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2014-05-19 | House | Committee recommends ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill with the same title, see H4091 |
2014-05-19 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee with an amendment |
2014-03-26 | House | Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2014-03-26 | House | Substituted for H425 |
2014-03-26 | House | Reported from the committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H4091 (Replaced by) 2014-05-21 - Published as amended, see H4108
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3984 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3984.pdf |