MA H3975 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Replaces legislation H3810

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on December 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 156 of the Acts of 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the commissioner of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance to convey a certain parcel of land in the city of Waltham

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the commissioner of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance to convey a certain parcel of land in the city of Waltham

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-21 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 156 of the Acts of 2017
2017-12-14SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2017-12-14HouseEnacted
2017-12-14SenateEmergency preamble adopted
2017-12-14HouseEmergency preamble adopted
2017-12-11HouseHouse concurred in the Senate amendment
2017-12-04HouseReferred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
2017-11-30SenateRead second, amended (as recommended by the committee on Ways and Means), ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
2017-11-30SenateRules suspended
2017-11-30SenateCommittee recommended ought to pass with an amendment
2017-11-02SenateRead and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2017-11-01HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2017-10-25HouseOrdered to a third reading
2017-10-25HouseNew draft of H3810
2017-10-25HousePending new draft of H3810
2017-10-25HouseReported from the committee on House Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

H3810 (Replaces) 2017-10-25 - New draft substituted, see H3975
H3811 (Similar To) 2017-11-01 - New draft substituted, see H3995
H3972 (Similar To) 2017-11-07 - Amendment #1 (Jones) adopted
H3833 (Similar To) 2017-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 123 of the Acts of 2017
S2102 (Similar To) 2018-02-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 26 of the Acts of 2018
H3995 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 68 of the Acts of 2018
H4037 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - House concurred in the Senate amendment with a further amendment
H4125 (Similar To) 2018-05-03 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2329 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - See H4037
H4524 (Similar To) 2018-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4635

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback