MA H3995 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Replaces legislation H3811

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 68 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the commissioner of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance to convey certain land in the city of Revere

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the commissioner of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance to convey certain land in the city of Revere

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2018-04-04 - House - House On Enactment Land Taking Yea and Nay No. 319 (Y: 154 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-12 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 68 of the Acts of 2018
2018-04-04SenateLaid before the Governor
2018-04-04SenateEnacted -see Roll Call #352 (Yeas 37 to Nays 0)
2018-04-04HouseEnacted - 154 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 319)
2018-03-29SenateRead second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
2018-03-29SenateRules suspended
2018-03-29SenateCommittee recommended ought to pass
2017-11-14SenateRead and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2017-11-14HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2017-11-01HouseOrdered to a third reading
2017-11-01HouseNew draft of H3811
2017-11-01HousePending new draft of H3811
2017-11-01HouseReported from the committee on House Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

H3811 (Replaces) 2017-11-01 - New draft substituted, see H3995
H3975 (Similar To) 2017-12-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 156 of the Acts of 2017
H1912 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H3972 (Similar To) 2017-11-07 - Amendment #1 (Jones) adopted
H3964 (Similar To) 2017-12-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 159 of the Acts of 2017
H4037 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - House concurred in the Senate amendment with a further amendment
H4125 (Similar To) 2018-05-03 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4148 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
S2329 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - See H4037
H4524 (Similar To) 2018-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4635

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback