MA H4524 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4635
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4635
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4635
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Tucker of Salem, a petition (subject to Joint Rule 12) of Paul Tucker that the commissioner of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance be authorized to convey a certain parcel of land in the city of Salem to the Salem Redevelopment Authority. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Directing the commissioner of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance to convey a certain parcel of land to the Salem Redevelopment Authority
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Tucker [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4635 |
2018-06-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2018 from 11:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-2 |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-05-17 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
2018-05-16 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
S1704 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4683
H3632 (Similar To) 2018-05-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4440
S1686 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4683
H4635 (Replaced by) 2018-07-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 156 of the Acts of 2018
H4802 (Similar To) 2018-07-30 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) adopted
H4923 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3632 (Similar To) 2018-05-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4440
S1686 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4683
H4635 (Replaced by) 2018-07-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 156 of the Acts of 2018
H4802 (Similar To) 2018-07-30 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) adopted
H4923 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4524 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4524.pdf |