MA H3810 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H3380
Note: Legislation replaced by H3975
Note: Legislation replaced by H3975
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on July 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-25 - New draft substituted, see H3975
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-25 - New draft substituted, see H3975
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the commissioner of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance to convey a certain parcel of land in the city of Waltham
Title
Authorizing the commissioner of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance to convey a certain parcel of land in the city of Waltham
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-25 | House | New draft substituted, see H3975 |
2017-10-25 | House | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) |
2017-10-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-10-25 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending |
2017-10-25 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2017-10-25 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill with the same title, see H3975 |
2017-07-17 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2017-07-17 | House | New draft of H3380 |
2017-07-17 | House | Reported from the committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H3380 (Replaces) 2017-07-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3810
H3814 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4683
H3975 (Replaced by) 2017-12-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 156 of the Acts of 2017
H3814 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4683
H3975 (Replaced by) 2017-12-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 156 of the Acts of 2017
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3810 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3810.pdf |