MA H3380 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3810
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3810
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3810
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the commissioner of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance to convey a certain parcel of land in the city of Waltham. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Authorizing the commissioner of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance to convey a certain parcel of land in the city of Waltham
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-17 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3810 |
2017-03-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/04/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S1754 (Similar To) 2017-09-18 - Hearing scheduled for 09/21/2017 from 02:00 PM-03:00 PM in 222
H1106 (Similar To) 2017-05-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 12 of the Acts of 2017
H1720 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H1114 (Similar To) 2017-04-20 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1102 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 198 of the Acts of 2018
H1718 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4683
H3717 (Similar To) 2017-07-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3809
H3810 (Replaced by) 2017-10-25 - New draft substituted, see H3975
H4265 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 189 of the Acts of 2018
H4301 (Similar To) 2018-07-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 128 of the Acts of 2018
H1106 (Similar To) 2017-05-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 12 of the Acts of 2017
H1720 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H1114 (Similar To) 2017-04-20 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1102 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 198 of the Acts of 2018
H1718 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4683
H3717 (Similar To) 2017-07-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3809
H3810 (Replaced by) 2017-10-25 - New draft substituted, see H3975
H4265 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 189 of the Acts of 2018
H4301 (Similar To) 2018-07-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 128 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3380 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3380.pdf |