MA H3833 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 123 of the Acts of 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 123 of the Acts of 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Lenox be authorized to convey a conservation restriction on certain parcels of land. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Lenox to convey a conservation restriction on certain parcels of land
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-11-14 - Senate - Senate Enacted roll call #281 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-11-13 - House - House On Enactment Land Taking Yea and Nay No. 282 (Y: 154 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-13 - House - House On Enactment Land Taking Yea and Nay No. 282 (Y: 154 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-21 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 123 of the Acts of 2017 | |
2017-11-14 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2017-11-14 | Senate | Enacted -see roll call #281 (Yeas 37 to Nays 0) |
2017-11-13 | House | Enacted - 154 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 282) |
2017-11-09 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2017-11-09 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2017-10-26 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2017-10-12 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2017-10-10 | House | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2017-09-18 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2017-09-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-09-18 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2017-09-13 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2017-09-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-07-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-07-19 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H3670 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 27 of the Acts of 2017
S2102 (Similar To) 2018-02-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 26 of the Acts of 2018
S1704 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4683
H3632 (Similar To) 2018-05-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4440
S1686 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4683
H3850 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4261
H3972 (Similar To) 2017-11-07 - Amendment #1 (Jones) adopted
H4125 (Similar To) 2018-05-03 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4148 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 131 of the Acts of 2018
H4923 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2102 (Similar To) 2018-02-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 26 of the Acts of 2018
S1704 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4683
H3632 (Similar To) 2018-05-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4440
S1686 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4683
H3850 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4261
H3972 (Similar To) 2017-11-07 - Amendment #1 (Jones) adopted
H4125 (Similar To) 2018-05-03 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4148 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 131 of the Acts of 2018
H4923 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken