MA H3944 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H2794
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-30 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H4380
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-30 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H4380
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to limited liability companies
Title
Relative to limited liability companies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-30 | House | Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H4380 |
2014-07-30 | House | Read third |
2014-04-29 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-03-25 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2014-03-12 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-03-12 | House | New draft of H2794 |
2014-03-12 | House | Reported from the committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H2794 (Replaces) 2014-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3944
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3944 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3944.pdf |