MA H3826 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H2349
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 253 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 253 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recommended by the committee on Health Care Financing as a substitute for a bill with the same title (House, No. 2349). December 1, 2011.
Title
Relative to premature infant hospital discharge and quality improvement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-22 | Senate | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 253 of the Acts of 2012 |
2012-08-13 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2012-08-13 | House | Enacted |
2012-08-09 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2012-08-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-07-31 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-07-31 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-07-31 | Senate | Amended by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S2406 |
2012-07-31 | Senate | Read second |
2012-07-31 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-07-31 | Senate | Read |
2012-07-18 | House | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2011-12-15 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2011-12-15 | House | New draft of H2349 |
2011-12-01 | House | Recommended new draft for H2349 |
2011-12-01 | House | Reported from the committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
H2349 (Replaces) 2011-12-15 - Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on Health Care Financing)
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3826 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17597&generalCourtId=1 |