MA H3815 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H2369
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 24 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 24 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recommended by the committee on Health Care Financing, as a substitute for a bill with the same title (House, No. 2369, changed). November 16, 2011.
Title
Relative to enhancing the practice of nurse-midwives
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-02 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 24 of the Acts of 2012 | |
2012-01-23 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2012-01-23 | House | Enacted |
2012-01-19 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed |
2012-01-12 | Senate | Motion to lay on the table pending and postponed to January 19, 2012 |
2012-01-12 | Senate | Read third (title changed) |
2012-01-12 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-01-12 | Senate | Read second |
2012-01-12 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2011-12-27 | Senate | Read and referred to the Senate Committee on Ethics and Rules |
2011-11-16 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2011-11-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-11-16 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2011-11-16 | House | Substituted for H2369 |
2011-11-16 | House | Recommended new draft of H2369 |
2011-11-16 | House | Reported from the committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
H2369 (Replaces) 2011-11-16 - New draft substituted, see H3815
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3815 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17596&generalCourtId=1 |