MA H3755 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish the Abigail Adams center for women in STEM to provide opportunities for women in the workforce in science, technology, engineering and mathematics professions. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.
Title
Establishing the Abigail Adams entrepreneurial program for women
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Silvia [D] | Rep. Carole Fiola [D] | Rep. Patricia Haddad [D] | Rep. Paul Schmid [D] |
Rep. Tram Nguyen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-10-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/05/2019 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in 222 |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-05-13 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies |
Same As/Similar To
H3429 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H979 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S549 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S1384 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
H2940 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) adopted
H979 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S549 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S1384 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
H2940 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) adopted
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3755 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3755.pdf |