MA H3750 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4213
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on April 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4213
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4213
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the city of Lowell be authorized to transfer and have air rights over certain parcels of park and state land. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the city of Lowell to transfer and have air rights over certain parcels of park and state land
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-19 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4213 |
2019-06-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-05-08 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H2749 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - New draft substituted, see H4819
H2269 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Accompanied S1514
S1514 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3824 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4022
H4022 (Similar To) 2019-09-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 69 of the Acts of 2019
H4213 (Replaced by) 2019-11-20 - New draft substituted, see H4225
H4225 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 128 of the Acts of 2019
S2445 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - New draft substituted, see S2636
H2269 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Accompanied S1514
S1514 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3824 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4022
H4022 (Similar To) 2019-09-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 69 of the Acts of 2019
H4213 (Replaced by) 2019-11-20 - New draft substituted, see H4225
H4225 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 128 of the Acts of 2019
S2445 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - New draft substituted, see S2636
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3750 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3750.pdf |