MA H4225 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4213
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on November 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 128 of the Acts of 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on November 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 128 of the Acts of 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the city of Lowell to transfer and have air rights over certain parcels of park and state land
Title
Authorizing the city of Lowell to transfer and have air rights over certain parcels of park and state land
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-20 - House - House On Enactment Land Taking Yea and Nay No. 139 (Y: 152 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-20 - Senate - Senate Enacted Roll Call #151 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-20 - Senate - Senate Enacted Roll Call #151 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-26 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 128 of the Acts of 2019 | |
2019-11-20 | Senate | Enacted - see Roll Call #151 [39 YEAS - 0 NAYS] |
2019-11-20 | House | Enacted - 152 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No.139) |
2019-11-20 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2019-11-20 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2019-11-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-11-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-11-20 | House | New draft of H4213 |
2019-11-20 | House | Pending new draft of H4213 |
2019-11-20 | House | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H4213 (Replaces) 2019-11-20 - New draft substituted, see H4225
H3750 (Similar To) 2019-11-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4213
H2749 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - New draft substituted, see H4819
H2269 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Accompanied S1514
S1514 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2445 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - New draft substituted, see S2636
H3750 (Similar To) 2019-11-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4213
H2749 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - New draft substituted, see H4819
H2269 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Accompanied S1514
S1514 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2445 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - New draft substituted, see S2636