MA H3824 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-31 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-31 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the city of Lowell be authorized to appoint retired police officers as special police officers within said city for paid detail assignments. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the city of Lowell to appoint retired police officers as special police officers within said city for paid detail assignments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-31 | House | Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4022 |
2019-07-31 | House | Read third |
2019-07-31 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-07-16 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-07-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-07-16 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2019-07-15 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-06-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-05-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H3823 (Similar To) 2019-08-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 63 of the Acts of 2019
S2200 (Similar To) 2019-06-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2240
H1333 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1586 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H1335 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S2240 (Similar To) 2019-08-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 52 of the Acts of 2019
S2293 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2361
H4022 (Similar To) 2019-09-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 69 of the Acts of 2019
H396 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H3262 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H4242 (Similar To) 2020-06-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 98 of the Acts of 2020
S2445 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - New draft substituted, see S2636
H4273 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2020
S2200 (Similar To) 2019-06-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2240
H1333 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1586 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H1335 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S2240 (Similar To) 2019-08-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 52 of the Acts of 2019
S2293 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2361
H4022 (Similar To) 2019-09-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 69 of the Acts of 2019
H396 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H3262 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H4242 (Similar To) 2020-06-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 98 of the Acts of 2020
S2445 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - New draft substituted, see S2636
H4273 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2020
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3824 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3824.pdf |