MA H3723 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 14 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-09-17 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 14 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-09-17 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Robert Aubrey, an employee of the Massachusetts Department of Transportation. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Robert Aubrey, an employee of the Massachusetts Department of Transportation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-17 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2015-09-14 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2015-09-03 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2015-09-03 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-09-03 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2015-09-03 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2015-08-10 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-08-06 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2015-07-16 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H110 (Similar To) 2016-07-21 - New draft substituted, see H4534
H2801 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2028 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4068
H3212 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1756 (Similar To) 2015-10-13 - Accompanied S999
H4761 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 386 of the Acts of 2016
H4774 (Similar To) 2016-12-28 - Laid before the Governor
H2801 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2028 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4068
H3212 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1756 (Similar To) 2015-10-13 - Accompanied S999
H4761 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 386 of the Acts of 2016
H4774 (Similar To) 2016-12-28 - Laid before the Governor
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3723 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3723.pdf |