MA H4774 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 27 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-28 - Laid before the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 27 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-28 - Laid before the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to authorizing the transfer of certain parcels of land in the city of Worcester to promote economic development. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Authorizing the transfer of certain parcels of land in the city of Worcester to promote economic development
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-28 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2016-12-27 | Senate | Enacted |
2016-12-27 | House | Enacted |
2016-12-27 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2016-12-27 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2016-12-27 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2016-12-27 | House | Read second, ordered to a third reading, rules suspended, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2016-12-27 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-12-27 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-12-27 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-12-22 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2016-12-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-12-22 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
2016-12-19 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4761 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 386 of the Acts of 2016
H110 (Similar To) 2016-07-21 - New draft substituted, see H4534
H2801 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2028 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4068
H3212 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H110 (Similar To) 2016-07-21 - New draft substituted, see H4534
H2801 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2028 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4068
H3212 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4774 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4774.pdf |