MA H3706 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-11-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 156 of the Acts of 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-11-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 156 of the Acts of 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
The committee on Ways and Means to whom was referred the Bill authorizing the Division of Capital Management and Maintenance to grant an easement over an access road in Upton State Forest (House, No. 1149, changed), reports recommending that the same ought to pass with an amendment substituting therefor the accompanying bill (House, No. 3706). For the committee, Brian S. Dempsey
Title
Authorizing the Division of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance to grant an easement over an access road in Upton State Forest
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-11-03 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 156 of the Acts of 2011 | |
2011-10-27 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2011-10-27 | Senate | Enacted - see Roll Call #106 [Yeas 34 - Nays 0] |
2011-10-26 | House | Enacted - 152 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 119) |
2011-10-06 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2011-10-05 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2011-09-15 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2011-09-15 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2011-09-15 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2011-09-12 | Senate | Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2011-09-08 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2011-09-08 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-09-08 | House | Ordered to the third reading |
2011-09-08 | House | Substituted for H1149 |
2011-09-08 | House | Recommended new draft for H1149 |
2011-09-08 | House | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3706 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17339&generalCourtId=1 |