MA H37 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S181
Note: Replaces legislation H317
Note: Replaces legislation H317
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on April 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
So much of the recommendations of the Department of the State Treasurer (House, No. 25) as relates to modernizing Lottery payment options. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Modernizing Lottery payment options
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-03-03 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2022-03-03 | House | Accompanied by S181 and H317 |
2021-06-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/21/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-04-13 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S1364 (Similar To) 2021-10-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 60 of the Acts of 2021
S1355 (Similar To) 2022-12-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 336 of the Acts of 2022
H26 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4587
H27 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
H3909 (Similar To) 2022-03-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 28 of the Acts of 2022
H3970 (Similar To) 2021-12-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 101 of the Acts of 2021
S2518 (Similar To) 2022-09-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 226 of the Acts of 2022
S2031 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2828
S203 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S181 (Replaces) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied H37
H317 (Replaces) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied H37
S1355 (Similar To) 2022-12-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 336 of the Acts of 2022
H26 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4587
H27 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
H3909 (Similar To) 2022-03-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 28 of the Acts of 2022
H3970 (Similar To) 2021-12-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 101 of the Acts of 2021
S2518 (Similar To) 2022-09-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 226 of the Acts of 2022
S2031 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2828
S203 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S181 (Replaces) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied H37
H317 (Replaces) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied H37
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H37 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H37.pdf |