MA S1355 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-09-23 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to authorize the investment of trust funds benefiting the town of Sherborn Library. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local approval received]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the investment of trust funds benefiting the town of Sherborn library

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-23SenateRead second and ordered to a third reading
2021-06-24SenateBill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2021-06-03JointHearing scheduled for 06/08/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29HouseHouse concurred
2021-03-29SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Same As/Similar To

H3894 (Similar To) 2022-05-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 57 of the Acts of 2022
H3727 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1364 (Similar To) 2021-10-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 60 of the Acts of 2021
S203 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
H3909 (Similar To) 2022-03-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 28 of the Acts of 2022
H3970 (Similar To) 2021-12-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 101 of the Acts of 2021
S2518 (Similar To) 2022-05-09 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H231 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied H40
S31 (Similar To) 2021-05-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 13 of the Acts of 2021
S941 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback