MA H3909 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 24 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-11-24 - Read third and passed to be engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to authorizing certain investments by the treasurer of the town of Groton. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing certain investments by the treasurer of the town of Groton

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-24HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2021-08-16HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2021-08-16HouseRules suspended
2021-08-16HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2021-08-02HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2021-07-16JointHearing scheduled for 07/27/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-06-28SenateSenate concurred
2021-06-24HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Same As/Similar To

S1364 (Similar To) 2021-10-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 60 of the Acts of 2021
S1355 (Similar To) 2021-09-23 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H26 (Similar To) 2021-09-03 - Hearing scheduled for 09/13/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H27 (Similar To) 2021-06-15 - Hearing scheduled for 06/21/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H28 (Similar To) 2021-10-13 - Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H3970 (Similar To) 2021-11-10 - Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2518 (Similar To) 2021-10-27 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2031 (Similar To) 2021-08-31 - Hearing scheduled for 09/14/2021 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
S203 (Similar To) 2021-06-15 - Hearing scheduled for 06/21/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S31 (Similar To) 2021-05-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 13 of the Acts of 2021

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback