MA H3672 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-8)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to event data recorders in autonomous vehicles. Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to event data recorders in autonomous vehicles

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-27HouseHouse concurred
2020-03-23SenateReporting date extended to Monday June 1, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-03-05HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday March 25, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-02-06SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-06HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday March 4, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-01-10JointHearing scheduled for 01/17/2020 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

H359 (Similar To) 2019-07-03 - Hearing scheduled for 07/15/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
H3270 (Similar To) 2019-10-29 - Hearing scheduled for 11/05/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H1529 (Similar To) 2019-09-17 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H1087 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Senate concurred
S2113 (Similar To) 2019-12-23 - Hearing scheduled for 01/02/2020 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-1
S2192 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2203
H3138 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3137 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4050 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Discharged to the Joint Committee on Financial Services
S2333 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
H2993 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3007 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback