MA H3653 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-11-24 - Hearing scheduled for 11/30/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Veterans and Federal Affairs Committee
Hearing: Nov 30 @ 1:00 pm in Virtual Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to flying the flag of the Commonwealth at half-staff to honor service members killed while on active duty. Veterans and Federal Affairs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to half-staff notifications

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-24JointHearing scheduled for 11/30/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs

Same As/Similar To

S2410 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/24/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H1435 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - Hearing scheduled for 11/02/2021 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H3642 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/24/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1132 (Similar To) 2021-09-16 - Hearing scheduled for 09/23/2021 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S2502 (Similar To) 2021-10-21 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2558
S2433 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2502
S2432 (Similar To) 2021-08-31 - Hearing scheduled for 09/07/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S2407 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/24/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback